KEGWORTH COMMUNITY LIBRARY

Charity number: 1162461
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £10.62k £16.74k £25.43k £12.63k £9.45k
Total expenditure £8.54k £6.63k £14.75k £10.15k £7.24k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £6.22k £10.43k £5.62k £5.55k N/A