Financial history YUMI NEPAL EARTHQUAKE APPEAL

Charity number: 1161519
Charity reporting is overdue by 231 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £3.29k £100 £300 £350 £1.25k
Total expenditure £0 £71.00k £1.27k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A