THE AMNA BEGUM COMMUNITY WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1164079
Charity reporting is overdue by 64 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 Overdue Overdue by 64 days
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Overdue Overdue by 64 days
Annual return 30 November 2019 22 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2018 30 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2017 26 October 2018 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2016 25 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 Not Required