THE AMNA BEGUM COMMUNITY WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1164079
Charity reporting is up to date (71 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020
Total gross income £4.32k £5.02k £12.47k £10.75k £12.88k
Total expenditure £4.02k £5.32k £7.66k £9.51k £7.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A