OPERATION FISTULA (UK)

Charity number: 1162031
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £57.58k £131.73k £220.93k £581.75k £906.87k
Total expenditure £74.18k £137.59k £153.64k £539.12k £654.57k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £581.75k £892.18k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £12.38k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 £91
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £2.22k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £587.12k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 £67.45k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 £5.47k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £144.22k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £539.12k £0