LEEDS PHILHARMONIC SOCIETY (CIO)

Charity number: 1162999
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £0 £148.32k £165.68k £58.10k £56.17k
Total expenditure £0 £74.02k £78.24k £56.79k £44.19k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A