OVERSEAS CHINESE STUDENTS CHILDREN'S FUND

Charity number: 1163886
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £12.27k £3.46k £8.87k £3.79k £3.44k
Total expenditure £21.75k £6.12k £12.01k £3.29k £20
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A