WHEELIN' WHEELERS

Charity number: 1162614
Charity reporting is up to date (19 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 19 April 2021 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 19 April 2021 19 days late Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 30 June 2020 91 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 30 June 2020 91 days late Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 30 June 2019 91 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 30 June 2019 91 days late Download
Annual return 31 May 2017 28 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 28 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2016 06 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 31 March 2017 On time Download