Accounts and annual returns DRAKE CALLEJA TRUST

Charity number: 1164114
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 09 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 09 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 10 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 10 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2019 30 June 2020 91 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 30 June 2020 91 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2018 05 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 07 March 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2017 13 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 13 March 2018 On time Download Open in new window