VIZSLA RESCUE

Charity number: 1162862
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £25.64k £27.21k £30.20k £41.70k £39.42k
Total expenditure £17.18k £20.99k £15.13k £20.07k £23.69k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A