Accounts and annual returns WILLOWDOWN PRIMARY ACADEMY P.T.F.A.

Charity number: 1162189
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 14 September 2021 11 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 14 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 14 September 2020 09 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 14 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 14 September 2019 11 August 2020 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 14 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 14 September 2018 14 October 2019 92 days late
Accounts and TAR 14 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 14 September 2017 04 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 14 September 2017 Not Required