Financial history WILLOWDOWN PRIMARY ACADEMY P.T.F.A.

Charity number: 1162189
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 14/09/2017 14/09/2018 14/09/2019 14/09/2020 14/09/2021
Total gross income £2.83k £7.23k £5.00k £10.89k £1.92k
Total expenditure £1.82k £6.74k £6.22k £11.33k £870
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £8.91k N/A