BRIGHTER FUTURE INITIATIVE

Charity number: 1163023
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 04 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 21 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 21 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2018 29 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 29 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 01 November 2018 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 28 November 2017 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required