AKURANA WELFARE ASSOCIATION UK

Charity number: 1162958
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 12 May 2017 101 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required