AKURANA WELFARE ASSOCIATION UK

Charity number: 1162958
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £5.20k £8.52k £8.87k £11.84k £10.08k
Total expenditure £9.80k £6.27k £492 £5.49k £8.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A