WOLLESCOTE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 506451
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £9.27k £9.22k £12.83k £12.09k £16.54k
Total expenditure £8.97k £8.92k £9.66k £8.86k £6.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £12.00k