Financial history NEPAL EARTHQUAKE RECOVERY FUND

Charity number: 1162850
Charity reporting is up to date (18 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £23.20k £19.61k £8.40k £2.66k £2.89k
Total expenditure £28.35k £9.23k £4.64k £594 £479
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A