IDLEWILD ANIMAL SANCTUARY

Charity number: 1163184
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 15 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 21 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 21 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 15 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 15 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 10 June 2018 130 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 10 June 2018 130 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 11 December 2017 314 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 11 December 2017 314 days late Download