IDLEWILD ANIMAL SANCTUARY

Charity number: 1163184
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £56.94k £106.43k £106.00k £70.89k £97.05k
Total expenditure £35.13k £112.42k £112.00k £70.56k £96.46k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A