Trustees UNIVERSITY OF BRIGHTON STUDENTS' UNION
Charity number: 1164033

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doris Ugochi Uche | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anuraj Karmacharya | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ilia Mirsky Katz | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Quigg | Trustee | 14 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Harrison | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anna McElhinney | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Tindall | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sufia Begum | Trustee | 21 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alistair Welham | Trustee | 13 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Wilson | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.