SOUTHEND FOODBANK

Charity number: 1163160
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £20.81k £6.39k £18.69k £33.21k £86.84k
Total expenditure £3.31k £10.97k £18.00k £26.77k £34.73k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £1.60k N/A