Financial history YMDDIRIEDOLAETH CLOUGH WILLIAMS-ELLIS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1165883
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £905.73k £897.21k £984.98k £695.06k £954.97k
Total expenditure £1.06m £1.03m £986.40k £771.01k £891.33k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £9.46k N/A N/A £15.24k £867
Income - Donations and legacies £822 £146 £56.00k £15.24k £2.37k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £488.87k £488.98k £483.16k £376.74k £563.47k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £221.07k £221.92k £250.31k £119.79k £153.90k
Income - Other £194.96k £186.17k £195.51k £183.29k £235.23k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.06m £1.03m £986.40k £771.01k £891.33k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £23.63k £19.22k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0