NEKTON FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1162666
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
William Duff Goodlad Trustee 13 February 2020 None on record
Emily Victoria Penn Trustee 23 March 2018 None on record
Paul Andrew Jardine Trustee 06 November 2017 None on record
RUPERT GREY Trustee 17 June 2015
THE MARY ROSE TRUST Received: On time
THE MAGNUM PHOTOS FOUNDATION Received: On time
Captain Paul Anthony Crowther Trustee 08 November 2017 None on record
Vanessa Rice Trustee 16 May 2019 None on record
Professor Callum Michael Roberts Trustee 30 January 2019 None on record
JULIET CATHARINE BURNETT Trustee 31 October 2017 None on record
Angelique Louise Marie Pouponneau LLB, LLM Trustee 27 July 2020 None on record
Robert Dougall McCallum Trustee 30 January 2019 None on record