HOPE WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1165106
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £115.27k £168.02k £162.99k £168.73k £239.15k
Total expenditure £64.56k £173.04k £94.15k £165.29k £210.40k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A