Financial history Newark and Sherwood Community Hub

Charity number: 1164851
Charity reporting is up to date (85 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £45.37k £51.00k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £44.16k £39.00k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £23.76k £42.60k