OTTERY STATION

Charity number: 1163439
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Thomas Trustee 01 July 2016 None on record
Ian James Holmes Trustee 06 November 2019 None on record
GLYNDWR CHARLES DOBSON Trustee 30 September 2020
OTTERY ST MARY MILLENNIUM GREEN Overdue by 1773 days
Jane Eileen Ross Trustee 18 April 2018 None on record
Josefina Natalia Gori Trustee 03 February 2021 None on record
JOHN ALBERT CAMPION Chair 03 September 2015 None on record
Lorna Mary Brice-Nye Trustee 24 October 2018 None on record
SANDRA JANE CHAPMAN Trustee 03 September 2015 None on record
Anthony Paul Bartlett Trustee 03 February 2021
OTTERY FEOFFEE CHARITY Received: On time