Financial history LLANFAIRYNGHORNWY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 506596
Charity reporting is overdue by 1601 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/04/2018 04/04/2019 04/04/2020 04/04/2021 04/04/2022
Total gross income £10.15k £33.94k £6.78k £10.68k £4.02k
Total expenditure £10.44k £32.91k £4.65k £3.80k £14.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £8.45k £24.34k N/A £628 N/A