Financial history HACRO

Charity number: 1163064
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £93.55k £111.53k £213.62k £238.24k £349.88k
Total expenditure £99.51k £108.10k £158.19k £205.79k £234.16k
Income from government contracts £45.01k £62.17k £104.15k £82.77k £118.98k
Income from government grants £13.20k £6.90k N/A £31.04k £43.61k