ALFORD FOCAL POINT

Charity number: 1162899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £20.73k £34.33k £7.82k £12.62k £39.34k
Total expenditure £8.52k £29.66k £10.41k £11.17k £10.34k
Income from government contracts £5.17k £0 N/A N/A £5.17k
Income from government grants £7.80k £27.18k £5.81k £10.17k £33.72k