Financial history BARBICAN ART SOCIETY

Charity number: 1164194
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £9.12k £11.15k £17.25k £9.24k £14.19k
Total expenditure £8.13k £9.87k £14.54k £9.42k £13.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A