HACKNEY PLAYBUS

Charity number: 1163792
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JAMIE TANG Trustee 30 January 2020 None on record
ANNTOINETTE BRAMBLE Trustee 09 November 2010
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HACKNEY Received: On time
JULIE LE BON Trustee 30 January 2020 None on record
EMMA BRIDGE Trustee 05 March 2018 None on record
Vanessa Laura Kirkpatrick Trustee 30 January 2020 None on record
ANNABELLE BURNS Chair 24 October 2012 None on record
Tim Wooldridge Trustee 30 January 2020 None on record
STUART HUNT Trustee 05 March 2018 None on record
MINE OGUZ Trustee 25 June 2018 None on record
MALGORZATA PIECZONKA Trustee 25 June 2018 None on record