FRIENDS OF BROOKVALE PARK

Charity number: 1164852
Charity reporting is up to date (14 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 06 December 2020 20 October 2021 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 December 2020 20 October 2021 14 days late Download
Annual return 06 December 2019 19 October 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 December 2019 19 October 2020 13 days late Download
Annual return 06 December 2018 20 January 2020 106 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 December 2018 24 February 2020 141 days late Download
Annual return 06 December 2017 05 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 December 2017 06 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 06 December 2016 13 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

25 July 2017 On time Download