ECONOMY

Charity number: 1166046
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 13 January 2022 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 09 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 24 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 01 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 21 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 18 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 21 November 2017 On time Download