ECONOMY

Charity number: 1166046
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £342.29k £204.04k £215.95k £235.40k £319.86k
Total expenditure £250.14k £232.20k £229.87k £228.96k £251.05k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A £5.00k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £45.00k £44.70k