Financial history The Parochial Church Council of the Parish of St Etheldreda with St Clement, Fulham

Charity number: 1163860
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £187.72k £126.90k £192.63k £123.70k £183.42k
Total expenditure £105.63k £151.02k £143.11k £153.23k £174.31k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A