Accounts and annual returns THE BOURNE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1165790
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 July 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 22 October 2020 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 29 July 2019 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 21 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required