WATERBEACH TILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1164026
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 29 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 12 September 2020 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 31 July 2019 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 24 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 25 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required