WATERBEACH TILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1164026
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £9.29k £9.12k £7.99k £6.79k £15.51k
Total expenditure £7.50k £9.39k £8.81k £7.87k £8.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £10.00k