Financial history THE BUDDY BAG FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1164916
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £95.20k £95.16k £152.03k £238.00k £201.75k
Total expenditure £60.51k £100.34k £99.88k £175.71k £146.69k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A