ROCK CHRISTIAN CENTRE

Charity number: 1163895
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £217.14k £250.49k £229.26k £268.22k £297.26k
Total expenditure £147.33k £172.14k £187.32k £190.41k £205.22k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A