ROCK CHRISTIAN CENTRE

Charity number: 1163895
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 23 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 23 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2019 17 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 17 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2018 15 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 15 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 19 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 19 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2016 20 September 2017 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 20 September 2017 20 days late Download