BOROKURMA ISLAMIC ACADEMY

Charity number: 1165457
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 24 April 2021 12 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 24 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 24 April 2020 20 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 24 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 24 April 2019 19 May 2020 85 days late
Accounts and TAR 24 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 24 April 2018 19 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 24 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 24 April 2017 31 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 24 April 2017 Not Required