BOROKURMA ISLAMIC ACADEMY

Charity number: 1165457
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 24/04/2017 24/04/2018 24/04/2019 24/04/2020 24/04/2021
Total gross income £6.49k £4.06k £4.50k £7.06k £9.31k
Total expenditure £8.39k £4.58k £2.00k £3.50k £5.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A