Financial history ST. YARED'S TRUST (UK)

Charity number: 1164803
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 07/09/2016 09/09/2017 09/09/2018 09/09/2019 09/09/2020
Total gross income £11.54k £36.99k £11.84k £17.53k £11.91k
Total expenditure £451 £42.71k £16.73k £14.04k £10.24k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A