Trustees DEAN BANK & FERRYHILL LITERARY INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1164696
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Debra Kobasa Chair 01 October 2016
None on record
Wendy Smith Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
Celia Higginbottom Trustee 03 February 2018
None on record
Fiona Duke Trustee 20 October 2016
None on record
KATHLEEN MASON Trustee 20 October 2016
None on record
Derek Bradley Trustee 11 September 2015
DEAF HILL WARD REGENERATION PARTNERSHIP
Received: 113 days late
JOAN WESTON Trustee 11 September 2015
None on record