ACROSS BORDERS

Charity number: 1170882
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Abuzar Mohamed Trustee 09 September 2020 None on record
Rosie Watt Trustee 04 April 2019 None on record
Temitope Yusuf Trustee 07 November 2020 None on record
Fiona Cameron Chair 01 December 2016
AMERA INTERNATIONAL LIMITED Received: On time
Wafa Suleiman Trustee 19 August 2020 None on record
Emma Goldie Trustee 06 September 2018 None on record