MANCHESTER YOUTH ACADEMY LTD

Charity number: 1164599
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £61.69k £29.63k £44.20k £45.71k £40.55k
Total expenditure £61.69k £28.52k £44.10k £43.81k £31.87k
Income from government contracts £61.69k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £29.63k £13.73k N/A £26.80k