Financial history BUTTERFLIES - HAVEN

Charity number: 1168333
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £26.27k £21.13k £21.13k £17.66k £20.68k
Total expenditure £9.08k £14.93k £14.93k £19.65k £13.78k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A