Accounts and annual returns ST MATTHEWS CHRISTIAN SPIRITUALIST CHURCH 1999 LTD

Charity number: 1166334
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 13 May 2019 102 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required