Financial history ST MATTHEWS CHRISTIAN SPIRITUALIST CHURCH 1999 LTD

Charity number: 1166334
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £11.26k £13.77k £3.10k £9.49k £1.28k
Total expenditure £7.93k £8.22k £1.10k £5.30k £3.62k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A